# Trick of the Day - Multiplication by 25, 50, 75, 125

## Trick of the Day - Multiplication by 25, 50, 75, 125

So...

The inaugral trick shall be the simple, basic, yet useful, multiplication by 25 trick

Sooooooooo....

Lets begin

ex.1 - 15 * 25 = ?

1. First, divide the non- 25 number by 4.

2. Write the quotient down (3 in this case since 15/4 = 3R3)

3. Then, if the remainder is:

0 - write down 00 next to the quotient

1 - write down 25 next to the quotient

2 - write down 50 next to the quotient

3 - write down 75 next to the quotient

4. Since the remainder is 3 in our case, write down 75 next to the quotient and... you have your answer

15*25 = 375

Lets look at another one:

ex.2 - 63 * 25 = ?

1. First, divide the non- 25 number by 4.

2. Write the quotient down (15 in this case since 63/4 = 15R3)

3. Then, if the remainder is:

0 - write down 00 next to the quotient

1 - write down 25 next to the quotient

2 - write down 50 next to the quotient

3 - write down 75 next to the quotient

4. Since the remainder is 3 in our case, write down 75 next to the quotient and... you have your answer

63 * 25 = 1575

YEAHHHHHHH!!!!!!!

Now, lets look at multiplication by 50:

ex.1 - 33 * 50 = ?

1. First, divide the non - 50 number by 2.

2. Write the quotient down (16 in this case since 33/2 = 16R1)

3. Then, if the remainder is:

1 - write down 50 next to the quotient

0 - write down 00 next to the quotient

4. Since the remainder is 1 in our case, write down 50 next to the quotient and... you have your answer

33 * 50 = 1650

awesome!!!!!!!!!!!!!!

Now, lets look at multiplication by 75:

ex.1 - 33 * 75 = ?

1. First, multily the non - 75 number by 3, remember the number.

2. Divide the number by 4 Write the quotient down (24 in this case since 99/4 = 24R3)

3. Then, if the remainder is:

0 - write down 00 next to the quotient

1 - write down 25 next to the quotient

2 - write down 50 next to the quotient

3 - write down 75 next to the quotient

4. Since the remainder is 3 in our case, write down 75 next to the quotient and... you have your answer

33 * 75 = 2475

awesome!!!!!!!!!!!!!!

Now, lets look at multiplication by 125:

ex.1 - 33 * 125 = ?

1. First, multily the non - 125 number by 5, remember the number.

2. Divide the number by 4 Write the quotient down (41 in this case since 165/4 = 41R1)

3. Then, if the remainder is:

0 - write down 00 next to the quotient

1 - write down 25 next to the quotient

2 - write down 50 next to the quotient

3 - write down 75 next to the quotient

4. Since the remainder is 1 in our case, write down 25 next to the quotient and... you have your answer

33 * 125 = 4125

Inconcievable!!!!!!!!!!!!!!

PRACTICE PROBLEMS

1. 15*25

2. 33*25

3. 127*50

4. 330*75

5. 15*125

6. 64*75

7. 10*25

8. 65*50

9. 125*125

10. 65*125

11. 75*12

12. 11*125

The inaugral trick shall be the simple, basic, yet useful, multiplication by 25 trick

Sooooooooo....

Lets begin

ex.1 - 15 * 25 = ?

1. First, divide the non- 25 number by 4.

2. Write the quotient down (3 in this case since 15/4 = 3R3)

3. Then, if the remainder is:

0 - write down 00 next to the quotient

1 - write down 25 next to the quotient

2 - write down 50 next to the quotient

3 - write down 75 next to the quotient

4. Since the remainder is 3 in our case, write down 75 next to the quotient and... you have your answer

15*25 = 375

Lets look at another one:

ex.2 - 63 * 25 = ?

1. First, divide the non- 25 number by 4.

2. Write the quotient down (15 in this case since 63/4 = 15R3)

3. Then, if the remainder is:

0 - write down 00 next to the quotient

1 - write down 25 next to the quotient

2 - write down 50 next to the quotient

3 - write down 75 next to the quotient

4. Since the remainder is 3 in our case, write down 75 next to the quotient and... you have your answer

63 * 25 = 1575

YEAHHHHHHH!!!!!!!

Now, lets look at multiplication by 50:

ex.1 - 33 * 50 = ?

1. First, divide the non - 50 number by 2.

2. Write the quotient down (16 in this case since 33/2 = 16R1)

3. Then, if the remainder is:

1 - write down 50 next to the quotient

0 - write down 00 next to the quotient

4. Since the remainder is 1 in our case, write down 50 next to the quotient and... you have your answer

33 * 50 = 1650

awesome!!!!!!!!!!!!!!

Now, lets look at multiplication by 75:

ex.1 - 33 * 75 = ?

1. First, multily the non - 75 number by 3, remember the number.

2. Divide the number by 4 Write the quotient down (24 in this case since 99/4 = 24R3)

3. Then, if the remainder is:

0 - write down 00 next to the quotient

1 - write down 25 next to the quotient

2 - write down 50 next to the quotient

3 - write down 75 next to the quotient

4. Since the remainder is 3 in our case, write down 75 next to the quotient and... you have your answer

33 * 75 = 2475

awesome!!!!!!!!!!!!!!

Now, lets look at multiplication by 125:

ex.1 - 33 * 125 = ?

1. First, multily the non - 125 number by 5, remember the number.

2. Divide the number by 4 Write the quotient down (41 in this case since 165/4 = 41R1)

3. Then, if the remainder is:

0 - write down 00 next to the quotient

1 - write down 25 next to the quotient

2 - write down 50 next to the quotient

3 - write down 75 next to the quotient

4. Since the remainder is 1 in our case, write down 25 next to the quotient and... you have your answer

33 * 125 = 4125

Inconcievable!!!!!!!!!!!!!!

PRACTICE PROBLEMS

1. 15*25

2. 33*25

3. 127*50

4. 330*75

5. 15*125

6. 64*75

7. 10*25

8. 65*50

9. 125*125

10. 65*125

11. 75*12

12. 11*125

**Ani**- Vice-President
- Number of posts : 236

Age : 25

Location : Kanto

Registration date : 2008-05-02

Page

**1**of**1****Permissions in this forum:**

**cannot**reply to topics in this forum